Global Patent Index - EP 1260150 A2

EP 1260150 A2 2002-11-27 - Telescopic umbrella

Title (en)

Telescopic umbrella

Title (de)

Teleskopregenschirm

Title (fr)

Parapluie téléscopique

Publication

EP 1260150 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010574 A

Priority

JP 2001143779 A

Abstract (en)

A compact telescopic umbrella is provided, wherein an upper unit is provided at an end of a middle rod and a lower unit is slidably provided on the middle rod. An end of a main rib consisting of four pieces of mutually pivotally supported ribs is axially supported, and the main rib and the lower unit are connected by means of a receiving rib. Each rib of the main rib is folded in a straight line by interlocking with the vertical motion of the lower unit. Among the ribs of the main rib, a side curved portion and an inclined portion are formed on the third rib, and when the main rib is folded, a portion of the third rib opposite side of a pivotal portion with the second rib is not superposed on a portion of the second rib with the pivotal portion so that the portions are adjacent to each other. A four-side link mechanism is formed by the receiving rib and the second rib of the main. The first rib and the third rib are connected by means of the connecting rod, and the second rib and the fourth rib are connected by means of the connecting rod, whereby four-side link mechanisms and are respectively formed between the connecting rod and the main rib and the connecting rod and the main rib. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 25/02; A45B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 19/10 (2006.01); A45B 19/04 (2006.01); A45B 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 19/10 (2013.01); A45B 19/04 (2013.01); A45B 2019/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260150 A2 20021127; EP 1260150 A3 20030723; CN 1399927 A 20030305; JP 2002336019 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050910

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI