Global Patent Index - EP 1260156 A2

EP 1260156 A2 2002-11-27 - Modular shelf-system

Title (en)

Modular shelf-system

Title (de)

Modulares Regalsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'étagères modulaires

Publication

EP 1260156 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008917 A

Priority

AT 6472001 A

Abstract (en)

The modular shelf system has a number of shelf compartments in different geometric shapes, to be combined to form different shelving bodies. The shelf bodies are held together is a stable structure by support rods through them, and pins through the rods. Up to five shelf compartments of different geometric shapes can be assembled together in a combined modular configuration.

Abstract (de)

Modulares Regalsystem, welches aus bis zu 5 geometrisch unterschiedlich geformten Regalfächern besteht, die miteinander so kombinierbar sind, daß damit verschiedenartige Regalkörper zusammengebaut werden können. Die Regalfächer haben vorzugsweise in ihren Eckbereichen durchgehende Ausnehmungen, in welche Stützstangen zur Stabilisierung des Regalkörpers durchgesteckt werden. Die Stützstangen ihrerseits sind ihrer Länge nach mit horizontalen Löchern versehen, in welche Stifte zur Auflage der Regalfächer eingeschoben werden. Der Querschnitt der Stützstangen ist vorzugsweise etwas kleiner als der Durchmesser der Regalfächer-Ausnehmungen, wodurch ein Verschieben der Regalfächer in die gewünschte Position erleichtert wird und außerdem ein allenfalls erwünschtes Schrägstellen der Regalfächer ermöglicht wird. Die notwendige Fixierung der Stützstangen mit der Bodenplatte und der Kopfplatte wird dadurch erreicht, daß entweder der Querschnitt der Stützstangen ident ist mit dem Querschnitt der Plattenausnehmungen, oder in die etwas größeren Ausnehmungen dieser beiden Abschlussplatten werden Hülsen eingesetzt. Der Regalkörper wird zur endgültigen Stabilisierung in geeigneter Weise mit dem Mauerwerk verbunden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 87/00; A47B 57/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 87/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 87/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

PATENTANMELDUNG AT 1659200 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260156 A2 20021127; EP 1260156 A3 20040512; AT 411207 B 20031125; AT A6472001 A 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041101

2005-03-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47B 87/00 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47B 57/20 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI