Global Patent Index - EP 1260158 A2

EP 1260158 A2 2002-11-27 - Drawer for furniture

Title (en)

Drawer for furniture

Title (de)

Möbelschublade

Title (fr)

Tiroir pour pièce de meuble

Publication

EP 1260158 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007955 A

Priority

AT 7852001 A

Abstract (en)

The furniture drawer (2) can be mounted in a furniture carcass in a manner such that it can be pilled out. An electrical energy transmitter is provided to send electrical energy to the rechargeable battery (3) arranged in or on the drawer. An Independent claim is included for the furniture to which the furniture is installed.

Abstract (de)

Möbelschublade, die in einem Möbelkorpus ausziehbar lagerbar ist, gekennzeichnet durch eine Einrichtung (12a, 12b; 12a', 12b') zur Übertragung von elektrischer Energie an mindestens einen in bzw. an der Schublade (2) angeordneten, aufladbaren Stromspeicher. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00; A47B 77/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/08 (2006.01); A47B 88/00 (2006.01); A47B 88/04 (2006.01); A47B 97/00 (2006.01); F21S 9/03 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/0012 (2013.01); A47B 77/08 (2013.01); A47B 88/00 (2013.01); F21S 9/037 (2013.01); F21V 23/02 (2013.01); F21V 23/04 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0083 (2013.01); A47B 2220/0077 (2013.01); F21W 2131/301 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260158 A2 20021127; EP 1260158 A3 20030423; EP 1260158 B1 20051109; EP 1260158 B2 20080813; AT 413185 B 20051215; AT A7852001 A 20050515; BR 0201850 A 20030107; BR 0201850 B1 20111129; CN 1270654 C 20060823; CN 1386458 A 20021225; DE 50204823 D1 20051215; ES 2251539 T3 20060501; ES 2251539 T5 20090301; JP 2003000372 A 20030107; JP 4258702 B2 20090430; US 2002171335 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140410

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204823

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 308903 T

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204823

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130411

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130410

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120416

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2008-08-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080813

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2006-09-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAUL HETTICH GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20060807

2006-09-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GRASS GMBH

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-09-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAUL HETTICH GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20060807

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251539 T3

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204823 P 20051215

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JULIUS BLUM GMBH

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47B 88/00 A

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI