Global Patent Index - EP 1260163 A2

EP 1260163 A2 2002-11-27 - A pillow

Title (en)

A pillow

Title (de)

Kopfkissen

Title (fr)

Oreiller

Publication

EP 1260163 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253316 A

Priority

GB 0111723 A

Abstract (en)

A pillow (10) includes a series of juxtaposed sections (30, 40, 50, 60), each foldable relative to each other. Each section (30, 40, 50, 60) has information (36, 46, 56, 66) of an educational nature displayed thereon. Each section (30, 40, 50, 60) is also provided with a fixing means (32, 42, 52, 62) arranged to fix the pillow (10) in a folded arrangement in which the pillow (10) is useable for sleeping. Selected sections (30, 40, 50, 60) of the pillow (10) can be unfixed from one another and turned like the pages of a book, thereby allowing the information (36, 46, 56, 66) displayed thereon to be studied. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/1045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260163 A2 20021127; EP 1260163 A3 20031001; GB 0111723 D0 20010704

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-07-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI