Global Patent Index - EP 1260169 A2

EP 1260169 A2 2002-11-27 - Dispenser for fluid products such as liquid soap, disinfecting product etc

Title (en)

Dispenser for fluid products such as liquid soap, disinfecting product etc

Title (de)

Spender für flüssige Medien wie Flüssigseife, Desinfektionsmittel etc.

Title (fr)

Distributeur de produits fluides comme du savon liquide, du produit désinfectant, etc

Publication

EP 1260169 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011415 A

Priority

DE 10125842 A

Abstract (en)

Above the pump unit (10) the dispenser housing (1) has a bowl shaped recess (6) to take a removable adapter (3) screwing down as removable stopper onto the container. A valve (3) in the adapter admits a fluid to the pump (10) when the adapter is placed in the bowl (6) but halts fluid flow when removed. An opening (18) in the housing reaches through the bowl bottom via truncatedly raised part (20) in the bowl floor (8) so the raised part (20) supports a seal (22) operating between housing (1) and adapter (3). The valve disk opens or closes off the adapter hole and an adapter screw (50) serves to fit the container thread diameter.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Spender für flüssige Medien wie Flüssigseife, Desinfektionsmittel etc. weist das Spendergehäuse (1) oberhalb des Pumpenmechanismus (10) eine napfförmige Vertiefung (6) auf. In die Vertiefung (6) ist ein auf den Behälter (2) aufschraubbares, als abnehmbarer Verschluss für den Behälter (2) ausgebildetes Zwischenteil (3) einsetzbar. Das Zwischenteil (3) weist ferner eine Ventilanordnung (33) auf, welche beim Einsetzen des Zwischenteils (3) in die Vertiefung (6) des Spendergehäuses (1) den Durchfluss des Mediums in Richtung Pumpenmechanismus (10) freigibt und beim Abnehmen verschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/12 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/1211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260169 A2 20021127; EP 1260169 A3 20031119; DE 10125842 A1 20021205; DE 10125842 B4 20050609

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-09-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI