Global Patent Index - EP 1260209 A2

EP 1260209 A2 2002-11-27 - Medication applicator

Title (en)

Medication applicator

Title (de)

Medikamentenapplikator

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'administration de médicament

Publication

EP 1260209 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450088 A

Priority

AT 8202001 A

Abstract (en)

The oral medicament applicator (1) incorporates an outlet opening (5) whose cross section is larger than the clear interior cross section of the delivery hose (2).

Abstract (de)

Medikamentenapplikator (1) zur oralen Medikamentenverabreichung, bestehend aus einem länglichen, biegsamen Eingabeschlauch (2), der an einem offenen, mit einer Anschlussöffnung (4) versehenen Ende von einem Schutzschild (3) umgeben ist und der im Bereich seines anderen, geschlossenen Endes eine seitliche Auslassöffnung (5) aufweist. Zur Verlangsamung der Strömung des Medikamentes ist der Querschnitt der Auslassöffnung (5) größer als der lichte Querschnitt des Eingabeschlauches (2). Im Schutzschild (3) - aber auch in einer Erweiterung des offenen Endes des Eingabeschlauches (2) - kann eine Fingergreiföffnung (6) ausgebildet sein. Wenn der Applikator zumindest abschnittsweise durchsichtig oder durchscheinend ist, kann im Bereich des Schutzschildes (3) eine Beleuchtungseinrichtung (7) vorgesehen sein. Im Bereich des offenen Endes des Eingabeschlauches (2) kann wenigstens ein Kanal (8) ausgebildet sein, durch den z.B. ein Süßstoff bei der Medikamentenverabreichung gegen die Zungenspitze eingebracht werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/0046 (2013.01); A61J 7/0053 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 6007335 A 19991228 - SHEU MIIN-TCHANG [TW]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

AT 409717 B 20021025; AT A8202001 A 20020315; EP 1260209 A2 20021127; EP 1260209 A3 20031022

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-08-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-06-30 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040422

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI