Global Patent Index - EP 1260214 A1

EP 1260214 A1 2002-11-27 - Drug-releasing coatings for medical devices

Title (en)

Drug-releasing coatings for medical devices

Title (de)

Medizinische Wirkstoffe freisetzende Beschichtungen für medizinische Vorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Couches délivrant des agents médicinaux pour dispositifs médicaux

Publication

EP 1260214 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02017564 A

Priority

  • EP 98201276 A
  • US 84174797 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is directed to medical devices having a drug-releasing coating and methods for making such coated devices. The coating permits timed or prolonged pharmacological activity on the surface of medical devices through a reservoir concept. Specifically, the coating comprises at least two layers: an outer layer containing at least one drug-ionic surfactant complex overlying a reservoir layer containing a polymer and the drug which is substantially free of an ionic surfactant. Upon exposure to body tissue of a medical device covered with such coating, the ionically bound drug in the outer layer is released into body fluid or tissue. Following release of such bound drug, the ionic surfactant binding sites in the outer layer are left vacant. To maintain the pharmacological activity after delivery of the ionically bound drug, additional amounts of the drug are embedded or incorporated in the reservoir layer in a manner which allows the drug, which is substantially free of ionic surfactants, to complex with the vacant binding sites of the ionic surfactant of the outer layer. As a result, the surface of the medical device is enriched with the drug to provide sustained pharmacological activity to prevent the adverse reaction due to the presence of the medical device. The invention is further directed to medical devices with stabilized drug-releasing coatings. The coatings are stabilized by exposure to a low energy, relatively non-penetrating energy source, e.g., gas plasma or an electron beam energy source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/00; A61L 31/00; A61L 31/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/82 (2006.01); A61L 27/34 (2006.01); A61L 27/50 (2006.01); A61L 29/08 (2006.01); A61L 29/16 (2006.01); A61L 31/10 (2006.01); A61L 31/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/50 (2013.01); A61L 27/34 (2013.01); A61L 29/085 (2013.01); A61L 29/16 (2013.01); A61L 31/10 (2013.01); A61L 31/16 (2013.01); A61L 2300/236 (2013.01); A61L 2300/258 (2013.01); A61L 2300/41 (2013.01); A61L 2300/414 (2013.01); A61L 2300/42 (2013.01); A61L 2300/602 (2013.01); A61L 2300/606 (2013.01); A61L 2300/608 (2013.01); A61L 2300/61 (2013.01); A61L 2300/802 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6042875 A 20000328; AT 231718 T 20030215; AT 269055 T 20040715; CA 2236182 A1 19981030; CA 2236182 C 20050125; DE 69810986 D1 20030306; DE 69810986 T2 20031030; DE 69824648 D1 20040722; DE 69824648 T2 20050630; EP 0879595 A2 19981125; EP 0879595 A3 20000809; EP 0879595 B1 20030129; EP 1260214 A1 20021127; EP 1260214 B1 20040616; JP 4282106 B2 20090617; JP H10305105 A 19981117; US 5879697 A 19990309; US 6316018 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69824648

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120421

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120421

2013-01-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120421

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041116

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-04-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC SCIMED, INC.

2004-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-09-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-08-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC SCIMED, INC.

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824648 P 20040722

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0879595 P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DING, NI

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TRINH, TUYETHOA THI

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAEDER-DEVENS, JENNIFER E.

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 879595

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE