Global Patent Index - EP 1260247 A1

EP 1260247 A1 2002-11-27 - Low burden integrated chemical protective hood for use with helmets

Title (en)

Low burden integrated chemical protective hood for use with helmets

Title (de)

Integrierte leichtgewichtigen chemischen Schutzhaube für Schutzhelm

Title (fr)

Cagoule de protection chimique légère intégrée pour casque protecteur

Publication

EP 1260247 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02077024 A

Priority

US 29292901 P

Abstract (en)

A chemical protective hood (20) designed to be worn over a respirator (16) in a manner such that it is located between a helmet and the respirator (16). The hood (20) has a skirt portion (22) of filter barrier material containing an opening with edges configured to surround and fit against the respirator's facepiece. A top portion of the hood (20) is formed of a thin single layer (24) that fits under the helmet and is configured to match the curved inner surface of the helmet. The thin single layer (24) allows the helmet to be comfortably donned without requiring any modification to be made to the helmet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 17/04 (2006.01); A62D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 17/04 (2013.01); A62D 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CA 2027850 A1 19920418 - MAJESTY THE QUEEN HER IN RIGHT [CA]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260247 A1 20021127; CA 2385731 A1 20021124; US 2002174481 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI