Global Patent Index - EP 1260248 A2

EP 1260248 A2 2002-11-27 - Method and device for controlling a fire extinguishing plant with pressurized gas

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling a fire extinguishing plant with pressurized gas

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Gas-Hochdruck-Feuerlöschanlage

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la commande d'une installation d'extinction d'incendie à gaz sous pression

Publication

EP 1260248 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010558 A

Priority

DE 10125109 A

Abstract (en)

The method is for control of a high pressure gas fire extinguishant discharge circuit which has a electro-pneumatic control circuit (11) for a gas bottle (1). The circuit has a rapid opening valve (2) and a limiting valve. The method involves opening the rapid opening valve (2) through a force control when the pressure limiting valve (6) is opened. The control circuit can have a time limited magnetic valve for opening the rapid opening valve.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Gas-Hochdruck-Feuerlöschanlage, bei der das gasförmige Löschmittel unter hohem Druck in Hochdruck-Gasflaschen (1) gelagert und der Druck des Löschmittels auf seinem Weg von der Hochdruck-Gasflasche (1) zu den Löschdüsen zweimal reduziert wird. Dabei wird durch Zwangssteuerungen sichergestellt, dass sich immer erst das Bereichsventil (6) und sodann die Schnellöffnungsventile (2) der Hochdruck-Gasflaschen (1) öffnen, um im Störfall einen Staudruck im Rohrsystem zu vermeiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 37/36; A62C 35/68; A62C 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 37/36 (2006.01); A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 37/36 (2013.01); A62C 99/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260248 A2 20021127; EP 1260248 A3 20040121; EP 1260248 B1 20100609; AT 470485 T 20100615; DE 10125109 A1 20021205; DE 50214479 D1 20100722; DK 1260248 T3 20101004; ES 2347219 T3 20101027; PT 1260248 E 20100908

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100609

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110510

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120210

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120210

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2011-12-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-06-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50214479

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-01-05 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100609

2010-12-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100910

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100609

2010-10-27 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2347219 T3

2010-10-04 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2010-09-22 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-09-08 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2010-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214479 P 20100722

2010-07-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2010-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070117

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040429

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 62C 37/36 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 62C 35/68 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 62C 39/00 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI