Global Patent Index - EP 1260249 A1

EP 1260249 A1 2002-11-27 - Exercise apparatus with pneumatic cylinder

Title (en)

Exercise apparatus with pneumatic cylinder

Title (de)

Übungsgerät mit Pneumatikzylinder

Title (fr)

Appareil de gymnastique à vérin pneumatique.

Publication

EP 1260249 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02358010 A

Priority

FR 0106692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2824741A1] The apparatus has a moving component to which the user applies an effort, connected to a pneumatic cylinder (2) with a piston (57) sliding in a first chamber (54, 58). The first chamber is connected directly to a damping chamber (59) of greater volume through apertures (51) in its end wall. The two chambers are cylindrical in shape and coaxial, with the radius of the second cylinder between 3 and 6 times the radius of the first, giving it a volume at least 5 times greater. The damping chamber is connected by a pipe (47, 62, 63) to an air compressor (48).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention est relative à un appareil de gymnastique ou de rééducation comportant un vérin pneumatique, et en particulier à un appareil à contrepoids mobiles et à vérin pneumatique de compensation du contrepoids. Le domaine technique de l'invention est celui de la fabrication d'appareils de gymnastique à vérin pneumatique et à contrepoids mobiles. L'appareil (100) de gymnastique à vérin pneumatique (2) comporte un piston (57) monté coulissant dans une première chambre (54, 58) qui est en communication directe avec une chambre d'atténuation (59) dont le volume est supérieur à celui de la première chambre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 21/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/008 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/00181 (2013.01); A63B 21/00072 (2013.01); A63B 21/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5147263 A 19920915 - MUELLER KING L [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260249 A1 20021127; EP 1260249 B1 20051221; DE 60208112 D1 20060126; DE 60208112 T2 20060914; FR 2824741 A1 20021122; FR 2824741 B1 20030704

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080515

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080515

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080515

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-05-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060223

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60208112 P 20060126

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI