Global Patent Index - EP 1260286 A1

EP 1260286 A1 2002-11-27 - Bending machine with optimized management

Title (en)

Bending machine with optimized management

Title (de)

Biegevorrichtung mit optimierter Verwaltung

Title (fr)

Machine de pliage à gestion optimisée

Publication

EP 1260286 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291071 A

Priority

FR 0105860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2824286A1] The press has motors (18,20) driven by a control unit (50) and has a programmer (22) which can pass data to the control unit. The programmer has a keypad (40) to allow entry of data on the dimensions of the sheet, and the width of the 'V' that forms the bend. The programmer then computes (42,44) maximum and minimum speeds for bending, blocking speeds that are higher than maximum speed.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une machine pour plier des tôles comprenant un tablier inférieur fixe muni d'un Vé de pliage ; un tablier supérieur mobile muni d'un poinçon ; des moyens moteurs (18, 20) pour provoquer les mouvements du tablier supérieur; des moyens de commande (50) pour contrôler la vitesse de déplacement du tablier supérieur ; et des moyens de programmation (22) pour transmettre des informations aux moyens de commande. Les moyens de programmation comprennent des moyens (40) pour entrer des informations représentatives de dimensions de la tôle à plier et de la largeur W dudit Vé de pliage ; des moyens (42, 44) pour calculer, à partir desdites informations, une vitesse maximale de pliage autorisée Vc comprise entre des vitesses maximale VM et minimale Vm et des moyens (48) pour n'autoriser une vitesse de pliage que si elle est au maximum égale à ladite vitesse de pliage Vc. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/02 (2006.01); G05B 19/416 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260286 A1 20021127; EP 1260286 B1 20080604; DE 60226924 D1 20080717; FR 2824286 A1 20021108; FR 2824286 B1 20031031; JP 2003010917 A 20030115

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AMADA EUROPE

- Effective date: 20110430

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090305

2008-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60226924 P 20080717

2008-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT

2008-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030417

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI