Global Patent Index - EP 1260300 A2

EP 1260300 A2 2002-11-27 - A method of manufacturing an article

Title (en)

A method of manufacturing an article

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gegenstandes

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une pièce

Publication

EP 1260300 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253208 A

Priority

GB 0112876 A

Abstract (en)

A gas turbine engine (10) fan outlet guide vane (34) is manufactured by diffusion bonding titanium alloy sheet metal workpieces (52,54) together to form an in integral structure (66). A titanium alloy is weld deposited at predetermined positions (70,72) and in a predetermined shape to build up bosses (42,44) at the radially outer end (40) of the hollow integral structure (68). The integral structure (66) is inflated at high temperature to form a hollow integral structure (68) of predetermined aerofoil shape. Apertures (46,48) are drilled through the bosses (42,44) to enable the radially outer end (40) of the fan outlet guide vane (34) to be attached to a fan casing (32) of the gas turbine engine (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 9/04; B21D 26/02; B21D 53/04; B23K 20/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 9/04 (2006.01); B23K 20/02 (2006.01); B23P 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23P 15/04 (2013.01); B23K 9/044 (2013.01); B23K 20/02 (2013.01); B23K 2201/001 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49336 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49339 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260300 A2 20021127; EP 1260300 A3 20031008; EP 1260300 B1 20050824; DE 60205676 D1 20050929; DE 60205676 T2 20060309; ES 2243660 T3 20051201; GB 0112876 D0 20010718; US 2002174540 A1 20021128; US 6802122 B2 20041012

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243660 T3

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60205676 P 20050929

2005-09-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI