Global Patent Index - EP 1260317 A2

EP 1260317 A2 2002-11-27 - Hand grinding tool comprising a composite structure

Title (en)

Hand grinding tool comprising a composite structure

Title (de)

Hand-Schleifwerkzeug mit Verbundbauweise

Title (fr)

Outil à main pour meuler avec une construction composite

Publication

EP 1260317 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076896 A

Priority

DK BA200100131 U

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a grinding tool (1) for grinding a surface by hand, said tool comprising a composite layer structure. The structure includes a basis layer (2) with a grinding surface (4), at least one grip layer (3) and means (6,10) for binding said metal and said at least one grip layer (3) together, and gripping means (5) fastened onto said at least one grip layer (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 15/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260317 A2 20021127; EP 1260317 A3 20030806; DK 200100131 U3 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040207

2004-06-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI