Global Patent Index - EP 1260318 A1

EP 1260318 A1 2002-11-27 - Apparatus for polishing blades of cutting tools

Title (en)

Apparatus for polishing blades of cutting tools

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Polieren der Schneiden von Schneidwerkzeugen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour affiler les lames d'outils tranchants

Publication

EP 1260318 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291238 A

Priority

FR 0106584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2824770A1] The sharpener, consisting of a plate (1) with an aperture (2) for the tool to pass through, has spring-loaded and crossing rods (10, 12) to smooth the sides of the cutting edge. Each rod has an elongated U-shape with parallel curved sides and offset in-turned ends forming a flexible pivot. They are hinged on either side of the opening with the torsion provided by the pivots forcing them back together as they are pushed apart by the pressure of a blade passing between them, while their curvature ensures a constant angle of about 40 degrees between their surfaces. Stops (62) limit out outward movement of the rod ends in the rest position.

Abstract (fr)

Cet appareil pour affiler les lames d'outils tranchants comprend une platine (1) munie d'une ouverture (2) permettant le passage de la lame d'outil, en regard de laquelle ouverture (2) sont aménagées deux structures d'affilage (10, 12) en forme de broches allongées qui se croisent. Ces deux broches d'affilage (10, 12) sont articulées au niveau de l'une de leurs extrémités sur ladite platine (1), chacune d'un côté de ladite ouverture (2), et elles comportent des moyens de rappel élastiques, de manière à former un Vé d'affilage mobile sous la pression de la lame à affiler. Conformément à la présente invention, chaque broche d'affilage (10, 12) est constituée d'une tige conformée en U comprenant deux bras parallèles ou sensiblement parallèles (48, 50) qui sont reliés au niveau de l'une de leurs extrémités (52) et dont les deux extrémités libres comportent des retours à l'équerre formant des axes d'articulation qui viennent se loger, libres de rotation, dans des orifices d'encastrement désaxés aménagés sur un support approprié (3, 4) solidaire de ladite platine (1), de manière à obtenir un rappel élastique desdites broches d'affilage (10, 12) par un effet de torsion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 15/081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260318 A1 20021127; EP 1260318 B1 20070530; AT 363362 T 20070615; AU 4238002 A 20021121; AU 783875 B2 20051215; DE 60220336 D1 20070712; DE 60220336 T2 20080228; ES 2284795 T3 20071116; FR 2824770 A1 20021122; FR 2824770 B1 20031003; US 2003049998 A1 20030313; US 6769326 B2 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170509

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170310

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170310

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080517

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080517

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOBET MATERIEL

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-01-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284795 T3

2007-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60220336 P 20070712

2007-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI