Global Patent Index - EP 1260325 A1

EP 1260325 A1 2002-11-27 - Three-side trimming machine

Title (en)

Three-side trimming machine

Title (de)

Dreimesserschneidemaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de coupe à trois lames

Publication

EP 1260325 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01810505 A

Priority

EP 01810505 A

Abstract (en)

A disk cam (22) is configured to drive a front knife (4) and two lateral knives (5). Two pivotable levers (16,19) engage the drive curve (23) of the disk cam. The front knife and one of the two lateral knives are drivingly connected to the two pivotable levers.

Abstract (de)

Die Dreimesserschneidemaschine (1) weist ein Frontmesser (4) und zwei Seitenmesser (5, 6) auf, die von einer Antriebsvorrichtung (2) so angetrieben sind, dass sie phasenverschoben an einem Schneidgut (30) einen Frontschnitt und wenigstens einen Seitenschnitt durchführen. Die Antriebsvorrichtung (2) besitzt wenigstens eine Antriebskurve (23), die wenigstens zwei schwenkbare Hebel (16, 19) bewegt, mit denen das Frontmesser (4) und wenigstens ein Seitenmesser (5, 6) angetrieben werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/09 (2006.01); B26D 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/16 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0081 (2013.01); Y10S 83/934 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4737 (2015.04); Y10T 83/483 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8736 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8805 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8828 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8831 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8843 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260325 A1 20021127; EP 1260325 B1 20040811; DE 50103220 D1 20040916; JP 2002346972 A 20021204; JP 4043273 B2 20080206; US 2002170405 A1 20021121; US 6895847 B2 20050524

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170515

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103220 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI