Global Patent Index - EP 1260327 A2

EP 1260327 A2 2002-11-27 - Slicing machine with cutting device for film or paper

Title (en)

Slicing machine with cutting device for film or paper

Title (de)

Aufschnittschneidemaschine mit einer Schneideinrichtung für Folie oder Papier

Title (fr)

Machine à débiter en tranches équipée d'un dispositif de coupe de film ou de papier

Publication

EP 1260327 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02100418 A

Priority

AT 7932001 A

Abstract (en)

The machine for cutting film or paper into sections has a delivery unit for the cut sections, a feed system (13) with a cutter to cut the film or paper drawn off a roll (12), and a welding station (27). The feed has rollers (18) to support the supply roll, and take-off rollers (19) to draw off the film/paper web for the cutter (25). A clamping bar (22) holds the cut edge of the film web (23), to carry the web over the delivery position. The cutter severs the web, the clamping bar opens, and the cut section falls into the delivery position. The rollers and take-off rollers are powered by a drive motor (17) through cogwheels (15,16), operated by a control unit (8). A conveyor belt (10) extends from the welding station into the delivery zone. A drive motor (9) powers the conveyor, and additional conveyor belts (28,32).

Abstract (de)

Eine Aufschnittschneideanordnung umfasst eine Aufschnittschneidemaschine (1) mit Ablegeeinrichtung, eine Zufuhr- und Schneideinrichtung (13) für Folie oder Papier von einer Rolle (12) und gegebenenfalls eine Schweißstation (27). Die Zufuhrund Schneideinrichtung (13) weist Walzen (18) zur Lagerung der Rolle (12) und Abzugwalzen (19) sowie eine Schneidevorrichtung (25) und eine die Schnittkante der Folienbahn (23) erfassende Klemmleiste (22) auf, die die Folienbahn (23) über die Ablegeposition führt. Die Schneidevorrichtung (25) trennt den Folienzuschnitt ab, die Klemmleiste (22) öffnet und der Folienzuschnitt fällt in die Ablegeposition. Der Antrieb der Walzen (18) und Abzugwalzen (19) erfolgt über Zahnräder (15, 16) von einem Antriebsmotor (17) in der Aufschnittschneidemaschine (1). Von der Schweißstation (27) kragt das Förderband (10) in die Ablegeposition aus. Ein Antriebsmotor (9) für dieses und weitere Förderbänder (10, 28, 32) ist in der Schweißstation (27) untergebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/27 (2006.01); B26D 7/32 (2006.01); B65B 11/50 (2006.01); B65B 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/325 (2013.01); B26D 7/27 (2013.01); B26D 7/32 (2013.01); B65B 11/50 (2013.01); B65B 25/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

AT 409734 B 20021025; AT A7932001 A 20020315; DE 50211127 D1 20071213; EP 1260327 A2 20021127; EP 1260327 A3 20041013; EP 1260327 B1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211127

2016-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211127

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2016-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150425

2016-01-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-08-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-05-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080211

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211127 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-05-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI