Global Patent Index - EP 1260352 A1

EP 1260352 A1 2002-11-27 - Pelletizing machine and method of producing pellets

Title (en)

Pelletizing machine and method of producing pellets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pellets

Title (fr)

Presse à granuler et méthode pour la production des granulés

Publication

EP 1260352 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02425290 A

Priority

IT FI20010089 A

Abstract (en)

Pelletizing machine comprising at least a drawplate (1) made up of a cylindrical hollow body on the outer surface of which is a toothing consisting of more teeth (10) on the grooves (12) of which through holes (120) are provided able to define corresponding radial passages or ports between the outer surface (E) and the cavity (C) of said body, the latter being received with the possibility of rotating about the relevant longitudinal axis within the stationary structure (2) and being associated with means (4) provided for the movement thereof, characterized in that the said teeth (10) are provided with through holes (100) able to define corresponding radial passages or ports between the outer surface (E) and the inner cavity (C) of said body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/221 (2013.01); B30B 11/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260352 A1 20021127; IT FI20010089 A1 20021114

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120202

2011-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVS SLOVAKIA S.R.O.

2011-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOTRE SYSTEM S.R.L.

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070330

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTABILIA S.A.S. DI GHERARDINI A. E C.

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030212

- Countries: AL

2003-08-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030212

- Countries: LT

2003-08-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030212

- Countries: LV

2003-08-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030212

- Countries: RO

2003-08-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030212

- Countries: SI

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI