Global Patent Index - EP 1260363 A1

EP 1260363 A1 2002-11-27 - Regulating method for the operation of individually driven rotary machine elements

Title (en)

Regulating method for the operation of individually driven rotary machine elements

Title (de)

Regelungsverfahren zum Betrieb von einzeln angetriebenen rotierenden Maschinenelementen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le fonctionnement des composants de machines rotatifs entraînés individuellement

Publication

EP 1260363 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010666 A

Priority

DE 10125609 A

Abstract (en)

The regulation method for individual drives (M1,2) in a rotary printing machine with angular position adjustment. The drives can be connected together or connected to a common load (L). A correction value for the drive is derived from a peripherally defined parameter (UP) for the corresponding rotary drives in the form of an angular deviation signal (WA) fed to the input of an angle adjuster (WR).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Regelungsverfahren zum Betrieb von einzeln angetriebenen rotierenden Maschinenelementen (M1,M2) mit einer Winkellageregelung, die mit Kraftschluss oder über eine gemeinsame Last (L) gekoppelt sind. Dabei werden Umfang beschreibende Parameter (UP) der angetriebenen, korrespondierenden Maschinenelemente (M1,M2) in Form einer Winkellageabweichung (WA) dem Eingang des Winkellagereglers (WR) als Korrekturgröße zugeführt. Dies können Durchmesser oder Radien beteiligter Maschinenelemente (M1,M2), als auch ein Durchmesser und mindestens ein Durchmesserunterschied oder mindestens ein Radius und mindestens ein Radienunterschied sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/004

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01); B65H 2557/264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260363 A1 20021127; EP 1260363 B1 20070718; DE 10125609 A1 20021205; DE 50210481 D1 20070830; US 2002174789 A1 20021128; US 6714843 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210481

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210481

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100513

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100513

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080421

2007-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210481 P 20070830

2007-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-07-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI