Global Patent Index - EP 1260364 A2

EP 1260364 A2 2002-11-27 - Method for reducing the changeover time by automatic printing plate change

Title (en)

Method for reducing the changeover time by automatic printing plate change

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Rüstzeitreduzierung bei automatisiertem Druckformwechsel

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réduire le temps de préparation dans le changement des plaques d'impression

Publication

EP 1260364 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009245 A

Priority

DE 10125134 A

Abstract (en)

For the exchange of printing plates at a rotary printing press, with a series of printing station groups (6-9;11-14), each station has a printing plate change unit with operating modes for printing the upper side of the paper and both the upper and lower sides. A change unit (10) is between the groups of printing stations. The printing cylinders (2,3) of the second group of printing stations, after the change unit, are positioned by a reference format unit (21), at the machine control (20), to give a printing plate exchange in parallel at both groups of printing stations in pairs of plates each from one of the two groups. The reference format unit gives a setting angle corresponding to a phase difference.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Wechseln von Druckformen an Rotationsdruckmaschinen (1) in Reihenbauweise mit mehreren Druckwerken (6, 7, 8, 9; 11, 12, 13, 14), denen jeweils eine Druckformwechseleinrichtung zugeordnet ist und die im Schöndruck und im Schön- und Widerdruckmodus betreibbar sind und zwischen einer ersten Gruppe von Druckwerken (6, 7, 8, 9) und einer weiteren Gruppe von Druckwerken (11, 12, 13, 14) eine Wendeeinrichtung (10) vorgesehen ist. Die Druckwerkzylinder (2, 3) der weiteren Gruppe von Druckwerken (11, 12, 13, 14) nach der Wendeeinrichtung (10) werden anhand eines Referenzformates (21) so positioniert, daß ein Druckformwechsel (35) parallel an Druckwerken der ersten Gruppe von Druckwerken (6, 7, 8, 9) und den Druckwerken der weiteren Gruppe von Druckwerken (11, 12, 13, 14) durchgeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/00; B41F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260364 A2 20021127; EP 1260364 A3 20040114; DE 10125134 A1 20021205

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090506

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 27/00 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 7/06 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI