Global Patent Index - EP 1260366 A1

EP 1260366 A1 2002-11-27 - Leakproof pump for use in an inking mechanism of a rotary printing press

Title (en)

Leakproof pump for use in an inking mechanism of a rotary printing press

Title (de)

Lecksichere Pumpe für die Farbvorrichtung von einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Pompe étanche pour le dispositif d'encrage d'une machine d'impression rotative

Publication

EP 1260366 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02007471 A

Priority

JP 2001153553 A

Abstract (en)

A pump capable of metering a fluid such as ink to an offset printing press, comprising a pump body (1), with or without a cylinder (2), defining a bore (10 or 20) which is pressure-tightly closed at a first end thereof, a piston (3) slidably received in the bore for both rotation and linear reciprocation and having one end projecting from a second end of the bore, the piston being capable of blocking both suction port and discharge port and alternately placing the same in communication with the bore during each complete revolution thereof, a drive motor (4) mounted to the pump body (1) and having a drive shaft (40) rotatable about an axis (CL1) intersecting the axis (CL2) of rotation of the piston at a prescribed angle (θ), and a drive linkage (50, 51 and 52)) connecting the drive shaft of the drive motor to the piston so as to cause joint rotation and linear reciprocation of the latter in response to the rotation of the former. The second end of the bore (10 or 20) is sealed by an end seal (6, 6a or 6b) against the leakage of the printing ink from between the pump body (1) or cylinder (2) and the piston (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2006.01); F04B 7/06 (2006.01); F04B 9/02 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260366 A1 20021127; EP 1260366 B1 20080123; DE 60224750 D1 20080313; DE 60224750 T2 20090122; JP 2002349424 A 20021204; US 2002176791 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-12-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081024

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60224750 P 20080313

2008-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-01-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060628

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI