Global Patent Index - EP 1260367 A2

EP 1260367 A2 2002-11-27 - Apparatus and method for preventing ink from getting dry

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for preventing ink from getting dry

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verhinderung des Trocknens von Farbe

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la prévention du séchage de l'encre

Publication

EP 1260367 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02017933 A

Priority

  • EP 99107301 A
  • JP 10800098 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for printing sheets includes a plate cylinder (14) with a printing die (13) mounted thereon and an impression cylinder (15) disposed to oppose said plate cylinder. In the apparatus, sheets are passed through a clearance between the plate cylinder and the impression cylinder to carry out printing on the sheets. The apparatus further includes an ink transfer roll (17) and means for regulating an amount of the ink transferred, so that when printing is carried out, the ink is transferred to the printing die, while at the same time the ink transferred is regulated as the ink transfer roll rotates in contact with the printing die of the plate cylinder while the regulating means contacts a surface of the ink transfer roll. The apparatus further includes an ink fountain (A) provided between the ink transfer roll and the ink regulating means along an axial direction thereof, and an ink reservoir (36) for reserving the ink which is disposed above and adjacent to the ink fountain. At least one tube body (47) is provided between the ink reservoir and the ink fountain in such a way that one open end (47b) of the tube body communicates with the ink reservoir and another open end thereof opens into the ink fountain. The apparatus further includes means (46) for transferring the ink between the ink fountain and the ink reservoir through the tube body and means (32) for reciprocally moving the ink reservoir, the tube body, and the ink transfer means unitarily along the axial direction of the ink fountain. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0487244 A 19920319 - HITACHI LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950521 A1 19991020; EP 0950521 B1 20030723; EP 1260367 A2 20021127; EP 1260367 A3 20021211; EP 1260367 B1 20030903; ES 2198812 T3 20040201; ES 2201045 T3 20040316; JP 3370600 B2 20030127; JP H11300933 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110420

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100409

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080419

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080421

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070403

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201045 T3

2003-12-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0950521 P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT SE

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT SE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT SE

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 950521

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT SE