Global Patent Index - EP 1260375 A1

EP 1260375 A1 2002-11-27 - Apparatus for printing, erasing, and rewriting visible images on thermochromic recording material

Title (en)

Apparatus for printing, erasing, and rewriting visible images on thermochromic recording material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Drucken, Löschen, und Wiederbeschreiben von sichtbaren Abbildungen auf thermochromischem Aufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Appareil pour imprimer, effacer, et réinscrire des images visibles sur un matériau d'enregistrement thermochromique

Publication

EP 1260375 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02010231 A

Priority

  • JP 2001146394 A
  • JP 2001294030 A

Abstract (en)

An erasing apparatus (40) for use with a thermochromic recording medium (1) includes a heating means (21) for heating the thermochromic recording medium (1) at an erasing temperature to erase images printed on the thermochromic recording medium, and a stress applier (41) positioned downstream of the heating means (21) and for applying tensile stress to the thermochromic recording medium (1) heated by the heating means (21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/32; B41M 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41J 2/36 (2006.01); B41M 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/36 (2013.01); B41J 2/32 (2013.01); B41M 5/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5517228 A 19960514 - OBU MAKOTO [JP], et al
  • [X] US 5691758 A 19971125 - KAMADA TAKESHI [JP], et al
  • [X] US 5310718 A 19940510 - KODAMA KATSUYOSHI [JP]
  • [A] EP 0849086 A2 19980624 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] US 5530556 A 19960625 - MIURA SHIGEO [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 12 3 January 2001 (2001-01-03)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 08 6 October 2000 (2000-10-06)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 229 (M - 1598) 26 April 1994 (1994-04-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 361 (M - 1006) 6 August 1990 (1990-08-06)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 402 (P - 1580) 27 July 1993 (1993-07-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260375 A1 20021127; EP 1260375 B1 20040915; DE 60201214 D1 20041021; DE 60201214 T2 20050929; DE 60220782 D1 20070802; DE 60220782 T2 20071031; EP 1386746 A1 20040204; EP 1386746 B1 20070620

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150516

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150516

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60201214

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60201214 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI