Global Patent Index - EP 1260376 A2

EP 1260376 A2 2002-11-27 - Thermal transfer color printing method and apparatus

Title (en)

Thermal transfer color printing method and apparatus

Title (de)

Thermotransferfarbdruckverfahren und -vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'impression en couleurs d'un support par transfert thermique

Publication

EP 1260376 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02356097 A

Priority

FR 0106821 A

Abstract (en)

Procedure uses parallel ribbons in primary Colors passing beneath a printing block (B) between feed and take up spools and thermal transfer head(s) that moves between retracted and printing positions. It has a system for holding the ribbons under tension during the block's advancing movement, and a mechanism for moving the support before each advancing movement of the block. <??>Procedure uses two or more parallel ribbons in primary Colors passing beneath a printing block (B) between feed (36) and take up (38) spools and at least one thermal transfer head that moves between retracted and printing positions. It has a system for holding the ribbons under tension during the block's advancing movement to ensure partial rewinding as the block returns, and a mechanism (14) for moving the support before each advancing movement of the block by an amount equal to at least the width of the ribbons. Each ribbon spool has a hub containing a torque limiter in the form of a sleeve of a cellular synthetic material.

Abstract (fr)

Impression colorée par transfert thermique. Le dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé comprend : au moins deux rubans parallèles sous le bloc d'impression et s'étendant entre des bobines débitrices (36) et réceptrices (38), au moins une tête de transfert thermique mobile entre une position d'escamotage et une position d'impression, des moyens pour maintenir tendus les rubans durant la course aller du bloc et pour assurer, durant la course retour, le rembobinage partiel des rubans, et des moyens (14) pour déplacer ledit support avant chaque course aller du bloc d'une mesure au plus égale à la largeur des rubans. Application à l'impression de motifs détourables à partir d'une feuille adhésive. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/325; B41J 33/382; B41J 35/08; B41J 35/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 35/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 35/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260376 A2 20021127; EP 1260376 A3 20031112; FR 2825046 A1 20021129; FR 2825046 B1 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 2/325 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 35/22 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 33/382 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 35/08 B

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 2/325 A

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 35/22 B

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 33/382 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI