Global Patent Index - EP 1260409 A1

EP 1260409 A1 2002-11-27 - Vehicle headlight with reflector control device

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight with reflector control device

Title (de)

Fahrzeugscheinwerfer- Einstelleinrichtung des Reflektors

Title (fr)

Projecteur de véhicules automobile equipe de moyens de reglage de réflecteur perfectionnes

Publication

EP 1260409 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02016471 A

Priority

  • EP 97403057 A
  • FR 9615420 A
  • FR 9615422 A

Abstract (en)

The reflector has a movement axis which passes through the light source (21) or passes near to the light source in an axial direction. The movement axis is horizontal and generally perpendicular to the axis of the reflector (30). The reflector axis is defined by two projecting studs (35) which click fit into openings (15) formed in the reflector housing (10). . Automobile headlamp of type having a light source (21), a reflector (30), cooperating with the source to form the required beam shape, a housing (10), containing reflector and lamp bulb, closed by a glass (50) and a beam adjuster (32,33,60) which directs the beam by pivoting the reflector around a movement axis. The lamp bulb (21) is fixed.

Abstract (fr)

Un projecteur de véhicule automobile comporte une source lumineuse (21), un réflecteur (30) coopérant avec la source pour former un faisceau de photométrie souhaitée, un boîtier (10) recevant le réflecteur et la lampe et fermé par une glace (50), et un dispositif (32, 33, 60) de réglage de l'orientation du faisceau par pivotement du réflecteur autour d'un axe de basculement. Selon l'invention, la source lumineuse (21) est montée fixe dans le boîtier, et l'axe de basculement du réflecteur passe au voisinage de la source. Application notamment aux projecteurs de complément, en particulier longue portée ou antibrouillard. L'invention vise également des moyens de réglage de faisceau perfectionnés sans butée de fin de course. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60Q 1/068; F21V 14/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/068 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/0683 (2013.01); B60Q 1/068 (2013.01); F21S 41/675 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0847894 A1 19980617; EP 0847894 B1 20030502; AT 238928 T 20030515; AT 376504 T 20071115; DE 69721459 D1 20030605; DE 69721459 T2 20040226; DE 69738243 D1 20071206; DE 69738243 T2 20080731; EP 1260409 A1 20021127; EP 1260409 B1 20071024; ES 2198541 T3 20040201; ES 2295264 T3 20080416; US 6039466 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 376504 T

- Effective date: 20171216

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-22 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-16 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 69738243

2015-06-10 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20150120

2015-06-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20150120

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-20 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69738243

2015-01-20 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 69738243

2008-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 20080715

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295264 T3

2008-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080121

2008-01-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69738243 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0847894 P

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT SE

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT SE

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030414

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 847894

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT SE