Global Patent Index - EP 1260441 A1

EP 1260441 A1 2002-11-27 - Manual tying device for tying packets by means of steel band

Title (en)

Manual tying device for tying packets by means of steel band

Title (de)

Handbetätigtes Umreifungsgerät zur Umreifung von Packgut mit einem Stahlband

Title (fr)

Dispositif de cerclage manuel pour lier des paquets avec une bande en acier

Publication

EP 1260441 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405406 A

Priority

CH 9462001 A

Abstract (en)

The strapping device has a base plate with bearing face for mounting on packed goods and has a closing device and tensioner. The tensioner has a hand-operated lever for operating a tension wheel and an axial coupling (44) is provided in a force flow running from the tension lever (39) to the tension wheel (38). The axial coupling can have two coupling parts (44a, 44b) which can be brought in and out of engagement and which each have several geometrically predetermined segments.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem handbetätigten Umreifungsgerät zur Umreifung eines Packgutes mit einem Umreifungsband, das eine Grundplatte aufweist, die mit einer Auflagefläche zur Anordnung auf einem Packgut versehen ist, ferner eine Verschliesseinrichtung aufweist, mit der zwei Bandlagen dauerhaft miteinander verbindbar sind, das mit einer Spanneinrichtung versehen ist, mit der auf das Umreifungsband eine Bandspannung aufbringbar ist, wobei die Spanneinrichtung einen handbetätigten Spannhebel aufweist, mit dem ein auf einer Spannwelle angeordnetes Spannrad betätigbar ist, ferner mit einem Trennmittel versehen ist, mit dem das Band durchtrennbar ist, eine Kupplung für eine Wirkverbindung zwischen dem Spannhebel und dem Spannrad zu schaffen, die konstruktiv günstiger gestaltet ist, wird vorgeschlagen, dass in einem vom Spannhebel (39) zum Spannrad (38) verlaufenden Kraftfluss eine Axialkupplung (44) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/30; B65B 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/02 (2006.01); B65B 13/22 (2006.01); B65B 13/24 (2006.01); B65B 13/30 (2006.01); B65B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/305 (2013.01); B65B 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260441 A1 20021127; EP 1260441 B1 20040811; AT 273166 T 20040815; AU 4241902 A 20021128; AU 764769 B2 20030828; CA 2386714 A1 20021121; CA 2386714 C 20071030; CN 1214945 C 20050817; CN 1386676 A 20021225; DE 50200781 D1 20040916; JP 2003011911 A 20030115; MX PA02005050 A 20030820; NZ 519012 A 20031031; TW 528701 B 20030421; US 2002179174 A1 20021205; US 6729357 B2 20040504

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050111

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ORGAPACK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ORGAPACK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050521

2005-05-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050521

2005-05-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050521

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-12-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KLEIN & KLEIN

2004-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-11-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200781 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI