Global Patent Index - EP 1260447 A1

EP 1260447 A1 2002-11-27 - PULP MOLDED ARTICLE

Title (en)

PULP MOLDED ARTICLE

Title (de)

FASERFORMTEIL

Title (fr)

CORPS MOULE EN PATE

Publication

EP 1260447 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906353 A

Priority

  • JP 0101465 W
  • JP 2000056537 A

Abstract (en)

A pulp molded article (1) of the present invention comprises a neck portion (2) and a thread (5) provided on the outer surface of the neck portion (2), and has an overrun torque of 1 N.m or higher between the neck portion and a threaded cap screwed on the neck portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/0246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260447 A1 20021127; EP 1260447 A4 20040825; EP 1260447 B1 20070620; AU 3419401 A 20010912; DE 60129006 D1 20070802; DE 60129006 T2 20071004; WO 0164527 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080325

2007-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60129006 P 20070802

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-06-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR