Global Patent Index - EP 1260449 A2

EP 1260449 A2 2002-11-27 - Packaging comprising a container having a cover pivotably connected to it.

Title (en)

Packaging comprising a container having a cover pivotably connected to it.

Title (de)

Verpackung bestehend aus einem Behälter mit einem daran befestigten schwenkbaren Deckel

Title (fr)

Emballage comprenant un récipient avec un couvercle articule attache a celui-ci

Publication

EP 1260449 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076737 A

Priority

NL 1018140 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a packaging (1) comprising a container (2) and a cover (3) pivotably connected to it in which said packaging (1) has been manufactured integrally from a broadsheet and the broadsheet is punched and folded in such a way that the side of the broadsheet which is intended to be printed faces outwards at the outside of the packaging and the same side also represents the view of the packaging (1) across at least part of the inside of the container (2), the cover (3) and the accompanying edges (19,20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/24; B65D 5/66; B65D 85/12; B65D 85/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/22 (2006.01); B65D 85/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/12 (2013.01); B65D 5/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260449 A2 20021127; EP 1260449 A3 20040324; NL 1018140 C1 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI