Global Patent Index - EP 1260470 A2

EP 1260470 A2 2002-11-27 - Method and device for active dampening of vibrations in winding machines

Title (en)

Method and device for active dampening of vibrations in winding machines

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur aktiven Schwingungsdämpfung bei Wickelmaschinen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour l'amortissement actif de vibrations dans des enrouleuses

Publication

EP 1260470 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010992 A

Priority

DE 10125192 A

Abstract (en)

The winding machine includes two or more rolling cylinders (a,b,c,d) which together form a vibrating system through an imbalance or out-of-roundness. At least one of the cylinders experiences an active damping in relation to the vibration forces so that a number of vibration force measurements are taken per revolution of one of the cylinders. The rotary axis of at least one cylinder is then shifted by extra energy supplied from outside depending on the actual measured value so that the vibration forces are reduced. Independent claim describes device where a cylinder is fitted at the ends with movable bearings (6,7,8) associated with measured value recorders (9,10).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Dämpfung von Schwingungen beim Wickeln von Materialbahnen - insbesondere von Papier- und Kartonbahnen - mit mindestens je einer Walze (a,b) und einer Wickelrolle (c). Die Schwingungen werden aktiv gedämpft, d.h. daß eine Vielzahl von Meßwerten bezüglich der Schwingungskräfte pro Umdrehung der Walze (a,b) und/oder der Wickelrolle (c) gewonnen werden und daß eine Zusatzenergie - die unabhängig von der Energie des schwingenden Systems ist - in Abhängigkeit von dem aktuellen Meßwert eine Verlagerung der Drehachse mindestens eines Körpers (Walze (a,b) oder Wickelrolle (c)) bewirkt, so daß die Schwingungskräfte minimiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/16 (2006.01); B65H 18/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/16 (2013.01); B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2515/50 (2013.01); B65H 2601/125 (2013.01); Y10S 242/907 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260470 A2 20021127; EP 1260470 A3 20040512; EP 1260470 B1 20060913; AT 339376 T 20061015; DE 10125192 A1 20021128; DE 50208106 D1 20061026; US 2002185567 A1 20021212; US 7588208 B2 20090915

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140517

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2006-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061224

2006-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208106 P 20061026

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI IT SE

2006-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER GMBH

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI IT SE

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040408

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI