Global Patent Index - EP 1260474 A1

EP 1260474 A1 2002-11-27 - Drive for a cylinder of a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Drive for a cylinder of a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Antrieb für einen Zylinder einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Entraînement pour un cylindre d'une machine rotative d'impression

Publication

EP 1260474 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010804 A

Priority

DE 10124977 A

Abstract (en)

The drive for the cylinder (2,3) of a rotary printing machine has individually driven cylinder segments (12,14,19) each with an electric motor (9,15) connected to it and drivable from it. The cylinder can be driven together with a further cylinder (1) and the cylinder segments can be fixed to a star wheel (16) in engagement with a further star wheel of the further cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Um für einen Zylinder (2, 3) einer Rotationsdruckmaschine, der aus unabhängig voneinander verdrehbaren, antreibbaren Zylindersegmenten (12, 14, 19, 20) besteht, einen mechanisch einfachen Antrieb zu schaffen, stehen die Zylindersegmente (12, 14, 19, 20) mit jeweils einem Elektromotor (9, 15) in Antriebsverbindung und sind unabhängig voneinander antreibbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/16; B41F 13/004; B41F 13/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 13/62 (2006.01); B65H 45/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/168 (2013.01); B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41F 13/62 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01); B65H 2404/412 (2013.01); B65H 2404/4121 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260474 A1 20021127; EP 1260474 B1 20091028; DE 10124977 A1 20021128; DE 50213958 D1 20091210; US 2002177514 A1 20021128; US 6846279 B2 20050125

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130515

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213958

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50213958

- Effective date: 20120626

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100729

2009-12-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213958 P 20091210

2009-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2009-10-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI