Global Patent Index - EP 1260475 A1

EP 1260475 A1 2002-11-27 - Yarn winding apparatus and method of producing a yarn package

Title (en)

Yarn winding apparatus and method of producing a yarn package

Title (de)

Spulvorrichtung für Fäden und Verfahren zur Bildung einer Spule

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bobinage pour fils et procédé de formation de bobine

Publication

EP 1260475 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02010456 A

Priority

JP 2001152185 A

Abstract (en)

A yarn winding apparatus having a fitting structure at connecting portion of a spindle (8) and a motor shaft (12), which fitting structure is constructed with a hole provided at the end surface of the motor shaft and an end portion of the spindle inserted into the hole or a hole provided at the end surface of the spindle and an end portion of the motor shaft inserted into the hole. At the connecting portion, the fitting structure forms a deflection control means for substantially conforming deflections of the spindle and the motor shaft with each other by supporting the spindle based on stiffness of the motor shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/44; B65H 54/54; B65H 54/547

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/44 (2006.01); B65H 54/547 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/44 (2013.01); B65H 54/547 (2013.01); B65H 2402/632 (2013.01); B65H 2601/524 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260475 A1 20021127; CN 1329270 C 20070801; CN 1386695 A 20021225; KR 20020089185 A 20021129; TW 565525 B 20031211

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051229

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040723

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI