Global Patent Index - EP 1260478 A2

EP 1260478 A2 2002-11-27 - Hydraulic arrangement for the lift cylinder of an industrial truck

Title (en)

Hydraulic arrangement for the lift cylinder of an industrial truck

Title (de)

Hydraulische Anordnung für die Hubzylinder eines Flurförderzeugs

Title (fr)

Agencement hydraulique pour le vérin de levage d' un chariot de manutention

Publication

EP 1260478 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010826 A

Priority

DE 10125351 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic cylinder circuit for an agricultural feed conveyor has a first extendible primary cylinder (4) with a larger piston diameter than the secondary cylinder (2,3). The secondary cylinder has a pressure dependent opening closure valve (5). The primary cylinder can be switched by the second and there can be a third secondary cylinder for parallel switching.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine hydraulische Anordnung für mindestens zwei, an eine gemeinsame Druckmittelversorgung angeschlossene Hubzylinder eines Flurförderzeugs. Einer der Hubzylinder ist als zuerst ausfahrender Primärzylinder (4) vorgesehen und weist einen größeren Kolbendurchmesser auf als der zweite Hubzylinder, der als nachfolgend ausfahrender Sekundärzylinder (2 bzw. 3) vorgesehen ist. Um sicherzustellen, dass die Ausfahrfolge der Hubzylinder auch unter ungüntigen Umständen eingehalten wird, ist erfindungsgemäß dem Sekundärzylinder (3) ein druckabhängig öffnendes Sperrventil (5) vorgeschaltet. Der Primärzylinder (4) ist gemäß einer ersten Ausgestaltung der Erfindung dem Sekundärzylinder (2) nachgeschaltet. Es ist dabei ein zu dem Sekundärzylinder (2) parallel geschalteter zweiter Sekundärzylinder (3) vorgesehen ist, wobei das Sperrventil (5) dem zweiten Sekundärzylinder (3) vorgeschaltet ist. Es ist auch möglich, dass der Primärzylinder (4) parallel zum Sekundärzylinder (3) geschaltet ist. Das Sperrventil (5) ist bevorzugt in den Sekundärzylinder integriert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260478 A2 20021127; EP 1260478 A3 20050420; EP 1260478 B1 20080917; DE 10125351 A1 20021128; DE 50212778 D1 20081030

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50212778

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090515

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081217

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090515

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080917

2009-08-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090618

2008-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212778 P 20081030

2008-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2008-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-11-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050920

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI