Global Patent Index - EP 1260526 A1

EP 1260526 A1 2002-11-27 - FLUOROPOLYMER AND ELECTRIC WIRE AND CABLE BOTH COATED WITH THE SAME

Title (en)

FLUOROPOLYMER AND ELECTRIC WIRE AND CABLE BOTH COATED WITH THE SAME

Title (de)

FLUORPOLYMER SOWIE ELEKTRISCHER DRAHT UND KABEL WELCHE BEIDE MIT DIESEM BESCHICHTET SIND

Title (fr)

FLUOROPOLYMERE, ET FIL ET CABLE ELECTRIQUE ENROBE DUDIT FLUOROPOLYMERE

Publication

EP 1260526 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00956959 A

Priority

  • JP 0006048 W
  • JP 25418899 A

Abstract (en)

Although an electric wire or cable, which is coated with a fluorine-containing polymer comprising tetrafluoroethylene and hexafluoropropylene and, if necessary, perfluoroalkyl vinyl ether, wherein a melt flow rate (MFR) at 372 DEG C is within a range from 0.1 to 100, and the total content (ppm) of an alkali metal and an alkali earth metal does not exceed the value obtained by calculatingt from the melt flow rate (MFR) at 372 DEG C according to the formula (1) : <DF NUM="(1)">5.2 x e<0.125(MFR)> + 2 </DF> and exceeds the value obtained by calculating according to the formula (2) : <DF NUM="(2)">0.35 x e<0.125(MFR)> </DF> contains the alkali metal or alkali earth metal, electrical characteristics of the coated electric wire are not impaired and a core wire is not corroded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 14/26; C08F 8/06; C08K 3/18; C08K 3/28; C08L 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 14/26 (2006.01); C08F 8/06 (2006.01); C08K 3/18 (2006.01); C08K 3/28 (2006.01); C08L 27/18 (2006.01); H01B 3/44 (2006.01); H01B 7/02 (2006.01); H01B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/445 (2013.01); H01B 7/2806 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260526 A1 20021127; EP 1260526 A4 20081001; CN 1221578 C 20051005; CN 1382163 A 20021127; WO 0118076 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090219

2008-10-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08F 14/26 20060101AFI20010316BHEP

2008-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08F 8/06 20060101ALI20080827BHEP

2008-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08L 27/18 20060101ALI20080827BHEP

2008-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08K 3/18 20060101ALI20080827BHEP

2008-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08K 3/28 20060101ALI20080827BHEP

2008-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01B 3/44 20060101ALI20080827BHEP

2008-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01B 7/02 20060101ALI20080827BHEP

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE