Global Patent Index - EP 1260573 A1

EP 1260573 A1 2002-11-27 - Method for separating Coumafos from beeswax

Title (en)

Method for separating Coumafos from beeswax

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Coumafos aus Bienenwachs

Title (fr)

Procédé d'élimination de Coumaphos de la cire d'abeille

Publication

EP 1260573 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010146 A

Priority

DE 10125431 A

Abstract (en)

Removal of coumafos (I) from beeswax, by adsorption on activated carbon and filtration under pressure, is carried out by: (i) melting the wax; (ii) adding 5 g of powdered activated carbon per litre of liquid wax; (iii) forming a homogeneous suspension; (iv) allowing the suspension to stand for a pre-determined contact time; and (v) filtering in a pressure filter at a pressure difference of the filter medium of at least 1 bar. Removal of coumafos (I) from beeswax, by adsorption on activated carbon and filtration under pressure, is carried out by: (i) melting the wax; (ii) adding at least 5 g of powdered activated carbon per litre of liquid wax; (iii) forming a homogeneous suspension; (iv) allowing the suspension to stand for a pre-determined contact time; and (v) filtering in a pressure filter at a pressure difference of the filter medium of at least 1 bar.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Coumafos (O,O'-Diethyl-O"-(3-chlor-4-methyl-7-cumarinyl)-thiophosphat) aus Bienenwachs durch Adsorption an Aktivkohle und anschließender Druckfiltration beschrieben.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11B 11/00; B01D 15/00; C07B 63/00; C07C 7/12; C07C 27/26; C11B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 15/00 (2006.01); C07B 63/00 (2006.01); C07C 7/12 (2006.01); C07C 27/26 (2006.01); C11B 3/10 (2006.01); C11B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 671113 A 19520430 - NICHOLAS WEISER
  • [A] GB 665157 A 19520116 - JOHN JAY NAUGLE
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 08 30 June 1999 (1999-06-30)
  • [A] S. ZIMMERMANN ET AL.: "Bestimmung von Brompropylat, 4,4'-Dibrombenzophenon, Coumaphos und Fluvalinat in Bienenwachs", DEUTSCHE LEBENSMITTEL-RUNDSCHAU, vol. 89, no. 11, 1993, STUTTGART, DE, pages 341 - 343, XP008006950
  • [A] J. KOCHANSKY ET AL.: "Comparison of the transfer of coumaphos from beeswax into syrup and honey", APIDOLOGIE, vol. 32, no. 2, 2001, ARBEITSGEMEINSCHAFT DER INSTITUTE FUER BIENENFORSCHUNG, CELLE, DE, pages 119 - 125, XP008006961, ISSN: 0044-8435

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260573 A1 20021127; EP 1260573 B1 20040922; AT 277152 T 20041015; DE 10125431 A1 20021128; DE 50201067 D1 20041028; HU 0201750 A2 20021228; HU 0201750 D0 20020729; US 2002174803 A1 20021128; US 6586610 B2 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170513

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170513

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170513

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170513

2018-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 277152 T

- Effective date: 20170513

2017-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50201067

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140306 AND 20140312

2014-01-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 277152 T

- Effective date: 20131211

2013-01-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER ANIMAL HEALTH GMBH, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50201067

- Effective date: 20121119

2012-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER ANIMAL HEALTH GMBH, DE

2012-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BAYER ANIMAL HEALTH GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 277152 T

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-10-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BAYER ANIMAL HEALTH GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER ANIMAL HEALTH GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50201067

- Effective date: 20120827

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH, 51373 LEVERKUSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50201067

- Effective date: 20120827

2012-09-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120816 AND 20120822

2012-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BAYER ANIMAL HEALTH GMBH

- Free text: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH# #51368 LEVERKUSEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BAYER ANIMAL HEALTH GMBH# #51368 LEVERKUSEN (DE)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH

- Free text: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH# #51368 LEVERKUSEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH# #51368 LEVERKUSEN (DE)

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-05-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050102

2004-12-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201067 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11B 11/00 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 15/00 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07B 63/00 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 7/12 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 27/26 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11B 3/10 B

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI