Global Patent Index - EP 1260575 A1

EP 1260575 A1 2002-11-27 - Product for cleaning surfaces for the removal of soils

Title (en)

Product for cleaning surfaces for the removal of soils

Title (de)

Reinigungsmittel zur Schmutzentfernung von Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Produit de nettoyage de surfaces pour en éliminer les Salissures

Publication

EP 1260575 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291280 A

Priority

FR 0106892 A

Abstract (en)

Aqueous composition for cleaning surfaces comprises 10-40 wt.% sodium, potassium or ammonium formate and has a pH of 7-9. An Independent claim is included for use of the product for the elimination of the stains on the frontages of buildings, particularly caused by air pollution.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un produit de nettoyage de surfaces pour en éliminer les salissures, consistant en une composition aqueuse contenant au moins un formiate de métal alcalin ou alcalino-terreux, ou d'ammonium

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/20; C11D 1/88; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/22; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/88 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/0052 (2013.01); C11D 1/88 (2013.01); C11D 3/1266 (2013.01); C11D 3/2075 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/225 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260575 A1 20021127; FR 2825100 A1 20021129; FR 2825100 B1 20051028

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051220

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE PT

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI