Global Patent Index - EP 1260577 A2

EP 1260577 A2 2002-11-27 - Liquid composition for use inside a toilet bowl, system and method for delivering the same

Title (en)

Liquid composition for use inside a toilet bowl, system and method for delivering the same

Title (de)

Flüssige Zusammensetzung für Klosettschüssel, System sowie Verfahren zur Freisetzung derselben

Title (fr)

Comosition liquide pour cuvette de toilette, système et méthode pour sa délivrance

Publication

EP 1260577 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02077816 A

Priority

  • EP 00947923 A
  • IT 9900219 W

Abstract (en)

A liquid composition (L) for use inside a toilet bowl (2) comprises: a) from 10 to 60% by weight of a suitable surfactant, b) from 2 to 25% by weight of at least one volatile substance adapted to evaporate at room temperature from the liquid composition (L) and restore said predetermined pressure after each delivering of dosed amounts of said liquid composition (L), c) from 1 to 25% by weight of at least one perfuming substance, and d) balance solvent. Advantageously, the liquid composition (L) according to the invention allows the delivery of dosed and constant amounts thereof at each water flushing independently of both the amount of liquid provided in the container (3) and of the frequency of the flushing operations thanks to the presence of at least one volatile substance adapted to evaporate at room temperature and to restore the pressure in the container (3) after each delivering.. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/43; C11D 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/032 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0104428 A1 20010118; AT 338853 T 20060915; AU 4649099 A 20010130; AU 6154600 A 20010205; AU 766247 B2 20031009; CA 2388233 A1 20010125; DE 60030571 D1 20061019; EP 1218602 A2 20020703; EP 1218602 B1 20060906; EP 1260577 A2 20021127; EP 1260577 A3 20021211; HU 0201883 A2 20020928; HU 0201883 A3 20040428; PL 353036 A1 20031006; TR 200200046 T2 20020821; WO 0106067 A2 20010125; WO 0106067 A3 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAZZANIGA, GIANCARLO

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUENZI, GIAN LUCA

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 03D 9/03 A, 7A 61L 9/05 B, 7A 61L 9/012 B, 7C 11D 3/50 B

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1218602

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;RO;SI