Global Patent Index - EP 1260577 A3

EP 1260577 A3 2002-12-11 - Liquid composition for use inside a toilet bowl, system and method for delivering the same

Title (en)

Liquid composition for use inside a toilet bowl, system and method for delivering the same

Title (de)

Flüssige Zusammensetzung für Klosettschüssel, System sowie Verfahren zur Freisetzung derselben

Title (fr)

Comosition liquide pour cuvette de toilette, système et méthode pour sa délivrance

Publication

EP 1260577 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02077816 A

Priority

  • EP 00947923 A
  • IT 9900219 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0104428A1] A device (1) for delivering an active substance in liquid phase inside a toilet bowl (2) is described, which comprises: a) a container (3) of the active substance, b) a supporting structure (4) for the container (3), c) hooking means (5) associated to the supporting structure (4) for supporting the container (3) and the supporting structure (4) inside the bowl (2), d) means (6) for delivering dosed amounts of said active substance, wherein the means (6) for delivering the active substance comprises valve means (7) cooperating with a delivering opening (8, 17) of said substance in fluid communication with said container (3), said valve means (7) being provided with an opening device (14) operable at each flushing by the water introduced into the bowl (2). Advantageously, the device according to the invention allows to deliver dosed amounts of active substance at each water flushing independently of both the chemical-physical properties of the active substance itself, of the amount of active substance provided in the container and of the frequency of the flushing operations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/03; A61L 9/05; A61L 9/012; C11D 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0104428 A1 20010118; AT 338853 T 20060915; AU 4649099 A 20010130; AU 6154600 A 20010205; AU 766247 B2 20031009; CA 2388233 A1 20010125; DE 60030571 D1 20061019; EP 1218602 A2 20020703; EP 1218602 B1 20060906; EP 1260577 A2 20021127; EP 1260577 A3 20021211; HU 0201883 A2 20020928; HU 0201883 A3 20040428; PL 353036 A1 20031006; TR 200200046 T2 20020821; WO 0106067 A2 20010125; WO 0106067 A3 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAZZANIGA, GIANCARLO

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUENZI, GIAN LUCA

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 03D 9/03 A, 7A 61L 9/05 B, 7A 61L 9/012 B, 7C 11D 3/50 B

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1218602

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;RO;SI