Global Patent Index - EP 1260608 A1

EP 1260608 A1 2002-11-27 - Method of depositing a MCrAIY bond coating

Title (en)

Method of depositing a MCrAIY bond coating

Title (de)

Verfahren zur MCrAlY-Haftungsbeschichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la déposition d'un couche de liaison à base de MCrAlY

Publication

EP 1260608 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01112646 A

Priority

EP 01112646 A

Abstract (en)

It is disclosed a method of depositing a bond MCrAIY-coating to a surface of an article for increasing the roughness for enhanced TBC adhesion. First, an inner layer on top of the surface of the article consisting of gamma / gamma '-MCrAlY is deposited using powder in the size range from 5 to 65 mu m. Second, an outer bond coating layer on top of the inner layer consisting of beta -NiAl or gamma / beta -MCrAlY or gamma / gamma '-MCrAlY is deposited using powder in the size range from 30 to 125 mu m.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 28/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/28 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 4/06 (2006.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/022 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 28/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9943861 A1 19990902 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]
  • [A] US 5579534 A 19961126 - ITOH MASAYUKI [JP], et al
  • [DA] US 4973445 A 19901127 - SINGHEISER LORENZ [DE]
  • [AD] US 4313760 A 19820202 - DARDI LOUIS E, et al
  • [A] DATABASE INSPEC [online] INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB; GUDMUNDSSON B ET AL: "Structure formation and interdiffusion in vacuum plasma sprayed CoNiCrAlY coatings on IN738LC", XP002181289, Database accession no. 3204625 & MATERIAL SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, APRIL 1988, SWITZERLAND, vol. 100, pages 207 - 217, ISSN: 0025-5416MATERIAL SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, APRIL 1988, SWITZERLAND1000025-5416207217

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260608 A1 20021127; JP 2003055753 A 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI