Global Patent Index - EP 1260635 A2

EP 1260635 A2 2002-11-27 - Flood barrier

Title (en)

Flood barrier

Title (de)

Hochwasserschutzbarriere

Title (fr)

Barrière anti-inondation

Publication

EP 1260635 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253153 A

Priority

GB 0112178 A

Abstract (en)

A collapsible flood barrier and method for erecting the same. The flood barrier comprises a water impermeable outer defining an interior cavity for receiving a fluid. In use the fluid present in the cavity erects the barrier. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260635 A2 20021127; EP 1260635 A3 20031217; GB 0112178 D0 20010711

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050611

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040429

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 02B 3/10 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/02 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI