Global Patent Index - EP 1260639 A2

EP 1260639 A2 2002-11-27 - Wall support on a mounting frame for sanitary devices

Title (en)

Wall support on a mounting frame for sanitary devices

Title (de)

Wandhalterung an einem Montagegestell für Sanitärapparate

Title (fr)

Support mural sur un cadre de montage pour appareils sanitaires

Publication

EP 1260639 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02405383 A

Priority

CH 9402001 A

Abstract (en)

The wall mounting for a bathroom fitting, at a mounting frame (2), has a connecting rod (3) and a mounting (4) at one end of it. At least the connecting rod has a push fit into the mounting to lock them together. The connecting rod is held in place by a clip nut (8) at the mounting, to give a rapid installation with a coarse setting for the mounting height, and allow for later fine adjustment. A wall cladding (7) is fitted over the mounting.

Abstract (de)

Die Wandhalterung weist eine am Montagegestell (2) gelagerte Verbindungsstange (3) und ein an einem Ende der Verbindungsstange (3) angebrachtes Befestigungsteil (4) auf. Wenigstens die Verbindungsstange (3) ist mit dem Befestigungsteil (4) steckbar verbunden. Vorzugsweise ist die Verbindungsstange (3) mittels einer aufgesteckten Clipmutter (8) mit dem Befestigungsteil (4) verbunden. Dies ermöglicht eine schnelle Montage mit einer Grobeinstellung der Montagetiefe und einer nachfolgenden Feinjustierung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/143 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0786562 A1 19970730 - GEBERIT TECHNIK AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260639 A2 20021127; EP 1260639 A3 20040121; EP 1260639 B1 20100106; EP 1260639 B2 20150819; AT 454508 T 20100115; DE 50214141 D1 20100225; PL 203127 B1 20090831; PL 353761 A1 20021202

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-13 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2015-08-28 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2015-08-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20150819

2015-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2015-08-19 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50214141

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214141

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-12-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GROHE AG

- Effective date: 20100930

2013-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214141

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214141

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2012-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100106

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100510

2012-04-11 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GROHE AG

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100106

2010-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-11-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GROHE AG

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100106

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100407

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100106

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100106

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100106

2010-08-04 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100417

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100506

2010-02-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214141 P 20100225

2010-02-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2010-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-01-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG

2009-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WALL SUPPORT ON A MOUNTING FRAME FOR SANITARY DEVICES

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070314

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI