Global Patent Index - EP 1260643 A2

EP 1260643 A2 2002-11-27 - Height adjusting device for a partition wall

Title (en)

Height adjusting device for a partition wall

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Höhenanpassung einer Trennwand

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ajustage de la hauteur d'une cloison

Publication

EP 1260643 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010792 A

Priority

DE 10124733 A

Abstract (en)

The actuator (12) for height adjustment of a partition wall is mounted non-tiltingly between a room floor and ceiling. It has inner and outer telescopic profiles (13,14) which can be locked in different extended positions. The extended positions can be held by a support block (15) inserted between them. The profiles can have a projection profile (11) fitting between the two panels of the partition.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zur Höhenanpassung einer Trennwand zwischen einer Raumdecke und einem Raumboden, wobei die Trennwand unten und oben kippsicher abgestützt ist, weist ein Höhenanpassungsbauteil zwischen Decke und/oder Boden und der Trennwand auf, welches mindestens zwei teleskopartig auseinanderziehbare Profilteile umfasst, die in unterschiedlichen Ausziehpositionen zueinander festlegbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/82 (2006.01); E06B 3/62 (2006.01); E06B 3/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/825 (2013.01); E04B 2/82 (2013.01); E06B 3/6202 (2013.01); E06B 3/6621 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260643 A2 20021127; EP 1260643 A3 20040121; DE 10124733 A1 20021128; US 2002189172 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-11-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDNER AG

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI