Global Patent Index - EP 1260647 A1

EP 1260647 A1 2002-11-27 - Groove and tongue connection between wall or roof elements

Title (en)

Groove and tongue connection between wall or roof elements

Title (de)

Nut-Federverbindung von Dach- und Wandelementen

Title (fr)

Fonction à rainure et languette entre éléments de mur ou de toiture

Publication

EP 1260647 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02006047 A

Priority

DE 20108555 U

Abstract (en)

A plastic seal (24) is provided inside an outward facing slot (23) between two adjacent panels (1). This seal is flush with the outer skin (5) of the panel. The panels have a hard synthetic foam or mineral fibre core (2), both surfaces (3, 4) of which are covered with a smooth or slightly textured steel sheet skin (5).

Abstract (de)

Um eine Nut-Federverbindung von Dach- und Wandelementen, die jeweils als plattenförmiges Sandwichelement mit einem Kern aus Kunststoff-Hartschaum oder Mineralfasern ausgebildet sind, dessen beide Oberflächen durch eine ebene oder leicht strukturierte Schale aus Stahlblech abgedeckt sind, zu schaffen, die eine Verwendung von Wandelementen zur Erstellung von Dächern ermöglicht, wobei zum einen Anschlüsse für Lichtkuppeln, Rauchgasanlagen oder dergleichen sehr einfach hergestellt werden können und zum anderen eine optimale Abdichtung zwischen zwei benachbarten Paneelelementen vorgesehen ist, ist in einem nach außen gerichteten Schlitz zwischen zwei benachbarten Sandwichelementen eine Dichtung aus Kunststoff vorgesehen, die mit der Außenschale bündig ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/292; E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2006.01); E04D 3/35 (2006.01); E04D 3/361 (2006.01); E04D 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2013.01); E04D 3/352 (2013.01); E04D 3/355 (2013.01); E04D 3/361 (2013.01); E04D 3/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20108555 U1 20010816; EP 1260647 A1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070522

2007-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070109

2005-12-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI