Global Patent Index - EP 1260657 A1

EP 1260657 A1 2002-11-27 - Lock arrangement

Title (en)

Lock arrangement

Title (de)

Schlossanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrure

Publication

EP 1260657 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112669 A

Priority

EP 01112669 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has a housing (1) with an opening for a lock plate (2) which itself has an opening for a lock bolt (5). The lock housing can be releasably mounted in a cassette (14) attached to a door (15). The side faces of the cassette can have openings for passage of the door handle cross shaft.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Schloßanordnung mit einem Schloßgehäuse (1), welches den Schließmechanismus des Schlosses einschließlich der hierfür erforderlichen Dreh- und/oder Längsführungen für die Lagerung der mechanischen Schloßbestandteile aufweist. Stirnseitig ist mit dem Schloßgehäuse (1) ein Stulp (2) verbunden, welcher mindestens eine Durchtrittsöffnung für Falle oder Riegel des Schlosses aufweist. Ferner sind Mittel zur Fixierung des Schloßgehäuses (1) in einer Aufnahmeöffnung z.B. einer Tür (15) oder eines Türrahmens vorhanden. Um eine Schloßanordnung für ein Sicherheitsschloß zu schaffen, die unter Wahrung eines hohen Sicherheitsstandards gegenüber unbefugten Manipulationen einen einfachen Austausch des Schlosses ermöglicht, ist in der Aufnahmeöffnung der Tür oder des Türrahmens eine zu dem Türspalt zwischen Tür und Türrahmen hin offene Kassette (14) befestigt. Das Schloßgehäuse (1) ist in die Kassette (14) eingesetzt und darin lösbar befestigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/02; E05B 9/08; E05B 45/08; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05B 45/06 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/02 (2013.01); E05B 9/08 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 63/0056 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 20009716 U1 20000824 - STEINBACH & VOLLMANN [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260657 A1 20021127; EP 1260657 B1 20040310; AT 261529 T 20040315; DE 50101655 D1 20040415

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101655

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101655

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG#PARKSTRASSE 11#42579 HEILIGENHAUS (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG#PARKSTRASSE 11#42579 HEILIGENHAUS (DE)

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101655 P 20040415

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020323

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI