Global Patent Index - EP 1260658 A1

EP 1260658 A1 2002-11-27 - Lock arrangement for a door, particularly for a security door

Title (en)

Lock arrangement for a door, particularly for a security door

Title (de)

Schlossanordnung für eine Tür, insbesondere für eine Sicherheitstür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrure pour une porte, notamment pour une porte de sécurité

Publication

EP 1260658 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112670 A

Priority

EP 01112670 A

Abstract (en)

The lock for a security door has shield plates (21,22) on each side surface of the lock. The shield plates have openings for a key and support sliding cover plates (33,34) for the openings. The lock has a sensor (44) for fixing the position of the slide covers. The sensor is connected to a central control. The sensor can be formed by contacts opened and closed by movement of the covers.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Schloßanordnung für eine Tür und insbesondere eine Sicherheitstür. Die Schloßanordnung besteht aus einem in einer Aufnahmeöffnung der Tür angeordneten Schloßgehäuse (1) sowie zu beiden Seiten des Schloßgehäuses das Türblatt aufgesetzten Schilden (21, 22), die zur Hindurchführung des Schlüssels jeweils mit einer Öffnung (32) versehen sind. Die Öffnung (32) ist bei abgezogenem Schlüssel durch einen Schieber (33, 34) abgedeckt, der an dem Schild (21, 22) geführt ist. Um Manipulationen durch Unbefugte an der geschlossenen Tür zumindest zu erschweren, ist in der Tür ein Detektionselement (44) zur Feststellung der Stellung des Schiebers (33, 34) angeordnet. Das Detektionselement (44) ist über eine Signalleitung mit einer zentralen Kontrolleinheit verbindbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/18; E05B 15/02; E05B 45/08; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/18 (2006.01); E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 45/06 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/186 (2013.01); E05B 15/02 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260658 A1 20021127; EP 1260658 B1 20040324; AT 262635 T 20040415; DE 50101766 D1 20040429

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101766

- Effective date: 20111201

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100505

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101766 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINBACH & VOLLMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020323

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI