Global Patent Index - EP 1260659 A2

EP 1260659 A2 2002-11-27 - Method for controlling an electronic lock

Title (en)

Method for controlling an electronic lock

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung eines elektronischen Schlosses

Title (fr)

Procédé de contrôle d'une serrure électronique

Publication

EP 1260659 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011312 A

Priority

  • DE 10125502 A
  • DE 10125866 A
  • DE 10126235 A
  • DE 10128146 A

Abstract (en)

Method for controlling an electronic lock (1) that has input element (2) for entry of a code that is compared with a code stored in memory to unlock the lock. Optional lock functions such as time access, individual access rights, opening delays, etc. are activated or deactivated by entry of an authorization code.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Steuerung eines elektronischen Schlosses, bei dem das Schloss über ein Eingabeelement zumindest hinsichtlich des Öffnens und Schließens gesteuert wird, indem Daten, beispielsweise ein Zugangsberechtigungscode eingegeben und mit einem abgespeicherten Code verglichen werden, bevor das Schloss geöffnet oder geschlossen wird. Um ein Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Schlosses derart weiterzubilden, dass das Schloss in einfacher Weise auf die Anforderungen des Anwenders eingestellt werden kann, ohne dass eine Einzelfertigung der entsprechenden Schlösser erforderlich ist, ist vorgesehen, dass optionale Funktionen des Schlosses, wie beispielsweise zeitliche Zugangsberechtigungen, personenbezogene Zugangsberechtigungen, Öffnungsverzögerungen oder dergleichen nach Eingabe eines Berechtigungscodes aktiviert oder deaktiviert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00571 (2013.01); G07C 9/00103 (2013.01); G07C 9/00166 (2013.01); G07C 9/00674 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00825 (2013.01); G07C 2209/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260659 A2 20021127; EP 1260659 A3 20040204

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-05 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140114

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060505

2005-01-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-12-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2004-12-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07C 9/00 A

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI