Global Patent Index - EP 1260660 A2

EP 1260660 A2 2002-11-27 - Actuation device for a lock bolt

Title (en)

Actuation device for a lock bolt

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für den Riegel eines Schlosses

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement d'un pêne d'une serrure

Publication

EP 1260660 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011344 A

Priority

ES 200101175 A

Abstract (en)

The follower (1) or door handle shaft which during rotary opening movement draws back a spring bolt (2) has a coaxial cam (8) rotatably coupled to same so that during normal rotary opening it turns rotationally secured but it can carry out independent rotation in the opposite direction. The cam has a circumferential projection (8a) which during this anti-opening rotation bears against a wing (9a) of a swing lever (9) which is fixed against spring action and has an attachment (9b) which bears against a ledge (10a) extending from a counter swing lever (10) which has an edge (10b) bearing from below up against a cross projection (6b) of the locking pawl plate (6). A lever (11) fixed freely rotatable coaxial with the swing lever has a swing lever arm (11a) and a bolt arm (11b) mutually spaced at an angular distance which is less than would be required so that the arms come into contact simultaneously with the wing of the swing lever in the rest state and with the back of the bolt in the retracted state.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Antriebsvorrichtung für den Vorschub des Riegels (3) von Schlössern weist die Türgriffwelle oder Nuß (1) einen koaxial drehbaren Nocken (8) auf, der in Öffnungsdrehrichtung drehfest mit der Nuß verbunden und in der entgegengesetzten Drehrichtung unabhängig von dieser drehbar ist. Ein Umfangsvorsprung (8a) des Nockens (8) kommt in der entgegengesetzten Drehrichtung gegen einen Flügel (9a) eines Schwinghebels (9) zur Anlage, der gegen die Wirkung einer Feder mit einem Ansatz (9a) gegen einen Absatz (10a) eines Gegen-Schwinghebels (10) zur Anlage kommt, der eine Kante (10b) aufweist, die gegen einen Quervorsprung (6b) einer Sperrklinkenplatte (6) zur Anlage kommt, wobei ein Hebel (11) frei drehbar koaxial zu dem Schwinghebel (9) befestigt ist und einen Schwinghebelarm (11a) und einen Riegelarm (11b) aufweist, die einen gegenseitigen Drehwinkelabstand aufweisen, der kleiner als der ist, der erforderlich wäre, damit die Arme gleichzeitig mit dem Flügel (9a) des Schwinghebels (9) im Ruhezustand bzw. mit der Rückseite des Riegels (3) in zurückgezogenem Zustand in Berührung kommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10; E05B 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/1086 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 63/18 (2013.01); E05B 2015/105 (2013.01); E05B 2063/207 (2013.01); Y10S 292/04 (2013.01); Y10S 292/44 (2013.01); Y10S 292/65 (2013.01); Y10T 292/0982 (2015.04); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260660 A2 20021127; EP 1260660 A3 20040616; BR 0201688 A 20030311; CU 23106 A3 20060120; DO P2002000401 A 20021215; ES 2213420 A1 20040816; ES 2213420 B1 20050501; MX PA02004944 A 20021129; RU 2002113446 A 20031127; US 2002175524 A1 20021128; US 6669245 B2 20031230

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061020

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050603

2005-03-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2005-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/10 A

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 59/00 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI