Global Patent Index - EP 1260665 A3

EP 1260665 A3 2003-06-04 - Security blocking means for overhead door

Title (en)

Security blocking means for overhead door

Title (de)

Sicherungsblockademittel für ein Deckenlauftor

Title (fr)

Moyens de sécurité bloquants pour porte suspendue

Publication

EP 1260665 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01128777 A

Priority

DE 20108860 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1260665A2] The top end of the wire (7) is connected to loading springs and the bottom end passes through a hole in a closure cap (10). A spring (9) presses against the inside of this cap. It pushes down on a fitting (8) accommodating a thickened portion on the end of the wire. The lower end of the fitting may bear on the end of the sliding bolt (12) there is a lever (13) extending downward from a pivot (14) near the bolt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 13/006 (2013.01); E05D 13/1215 (2013.01); E05D 15/24 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/488 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/67 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20108860 U1 20010823; AT 327399 T 20060615; DE 50109871 D1 20060629; EP 1260665 A2 20021127; EP 1260665 A3 20030604; EP 1260665 B1 20060524

INPADOC legal status


2017-12-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141203

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: LAKAL GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 327399 T

- Effective date: 20120621

2011-08-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LAKAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KARL ACHENBACH GMBH & CO. KG, 66117 SAARBRUECKEN, DE

- Document: DE 50109871

- Effective date: 20110617

2011-08-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50109871

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI VIEL & WIESKE, DE

- Effective date: 20110617

2011-08-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50109871

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI VIEL UND WIESKE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20110617

2011-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LAKAL GMBH

- Free text: KARL ACHENBACH GMBH & CO.KG#ZINZINGER STRASSE 11#66117 SAARBRUECKEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LAKAL GMBH#ZINZINGER STRASSE 11#66117 SAARBRUECKEN (DE)

2011-06-29 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110608

2009-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: PATENTANWALT DIPL.-ING. (UNI.) WOLFGANG HEISEL;HAUPTSTRASSE 14;8280 KREUZLINGEN (CH)

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060825

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-09-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-08-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALT DIPL. ING. WOLFGANG HEISEL

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109871 P 20060629

2006-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050610

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI