Global Patent Index - EP 1260666 A2

EP 1260666 A2 2002-11-27 - Driving device for a window or a door

Title (en)

Driving device for a window or a door

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für ein Fenster oder eine Tür

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entrainement pour une fenêtre ou une porte

Publication

EP 1260666 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011253 A

Priority

  • DE 10125518 A
  • DE 10143372 A

Abstract (en)

The adjustment element which produces the drive coupling between the operating element (20) and drive mechanism is mounted displaceable in the latter where it can be operated by the operating member of the window. The operating element is connected rotationally movable to the adjusting element so that the latter can move with the connected operating element through manual or motorised operation from a first position correlating with the tilt position of the window operating member into a second position correlating with the closed position. In the first position the operating element is in active engagement with the drive mechanism whereby a drive end of the operating element engages on a follower of the drive device. A coupling element (16) acting as an overload coupling is mounted between the operating element and drive motor.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antriebsvorrichtung für ein Fenster (F) oder eine Tür, welches einen Blendrahmen (B) und einen Schwenkrahmen (S), der über ein Betätigungsorgan des Fensters (F) kippbar ist, besitzt, wobei die Antriebsvorrichtung (1) ein Betätigungselement (20) aufweist, durch dessen Betätigungsbewegung der Schwenkrahmen (S) relativ zum Blendrahmen (B) bewegbar ist, wobei das Betätigungselement (20) von einer Antriebseinrichtung (10) der Antriebsvorrichtung (1) angetrieben ist, wobei die Antriebsvorrichtung (1) ein Verstellelement (30) aufweist, durch dessen Verstellbewegung eine antriebsfunktionelle Kopplung zwischen Betätigungselement (20) und Antriebseinrichtung (10) der Antriebsvorrichtung (1) herstellbar und lösbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß das Verstellelement (30) vom Betätigungsorgan des Fensters (F) betätigbar und verschiebbar in der Antriebsvorrichtung (1) angeordnet ist, daß mit dem Verstellelement (30) das Betätigungselement (20) drehbeweglich verbunden ist, so daß das Verstellelement (30) und somit das mit ihm verbundene Betätigungselement (20) durch eine entsprechende manuelle oder motorische Betätigungsbewegung des Betätigungsorgans des Fensters (F) zumindest von einer ersten Position, die zur Kipp-Stellung des Betätigungsorgans des Fensters korreliert ist, in eine zweite Position, die zur GeschlossenStellung des Betätigungsorgans des Fensters (F) korreliert ist, bewegbar ist, daß in dieser ersten Position des Verstellelements (30) das Betätigungselement (20) in Wirkeingriff mit der Antriebseinrichtung (10) der Antriebsvorrichtung (1) ist, indem ein Antriebsende (21) des Betätigungselements (20) an einem Mitnehmer (19) der Antriebseinrichtung (10) angreift, und daß zwischen dem Betätigungselement (20) und einem Motor (11) der Antriebseinrichtung (10) der Antriebsvorrichtung (1) ein als Überlastkupplung fungierendes Kupplungselement (16) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12; E05F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01); E05F 15/10 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/63 (2013.01); E05F 15/41 (2013.01); E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/236 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/11 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/25 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260666 A2 20021127; EP 1260666 A3 20041110; EP 1260666 B1 20081126; AT 415538 T 20081215; DE 50213039 D1 20090108

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170512

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213039

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213039

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090227

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090522

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOMFY S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090427

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090226

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-07-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-05-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090308

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213039 P 20090108

2008-12-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050704

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOMFY S.A.S.

2005-07-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-06-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05F 15/12 A

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05F 15/00 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI