Global Patent Index - EP 1260670 A1

EP 1260670 A1 2002-11-27 - Method for dimensioning a drilling riser

Title (en)

Method for dimensioning a drilling riser

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Dimensionierung eines Bohrlochrisers

Title (fr)

Méthode de dimensionnement d'un riser de forage

Publication

EP 1260670 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291245 A

Priority

FR 0107007 A

Abstract (en)

A design is chosen from a loads book and its apparent weight calculated. If the tension loads on the disconnected assembly are near a preset safety limit, the Von-Mises constraints are calculated for each tube section when it is connected. If these are near the tube material's elastic limit, each component is checked for the maximum tension, fatigue and dynamic loads imposed on the assembly Sizing a riser (1) connecting a seabed wellhead (2) to a floating support (7) via a main tube (8) comprises: (a) selecting the complete architecture of the riser using a book of loads, in particular to determine the thickness of the main tube and the type of float, and calculating the apparent weight of the assembly; (b) determining a safety margin on the tension of the assembly when it is disconnected from the wellhead, taking into account the apparent weight and the amplified tension at the head by movements of the floating support from which the assembly is suspended; (c) calculating the Von-Mises constraints in each section of the tube when it is connected to the wellhead, when the when the margin is near a preset value; and (d) when the constraints are near a predetermined criterion relative to the elastic limit of the tube material, obtaining the riser tube architecture and checking each component for compatibility with the maximum tension, fatigue and dynamic loads imposed on the assembly. The floatation device is modified until the margin of tension in the disconnected state is extended to the preset value, by varying the number of floats, the division of floats, the float diameter, or the density of the float material. The tube thickness is varied until the Van-Mises constraints approach the preset criteria of less than 2/3 of the elastic limit of the main tube steel. The calculations allow for a loss of thickness of the main tube and a loss of buoyancy of the floats. The margin is at least equal to 20 tonnes.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une méthode pour dimensionner un ensemble prolongateur (1) pour le forage en mer reliant une tête de puits sous-marine (2) à un support flottant (7) comprenant un tube principal (8), dans laquelle on effectue les étapes suivantes: on choisit une architecture complète de l'ensemble prolongateur à partir d'un cahier des charges, notamment en se fixant l'épaisseur du tube principal et des moyens de flottaison, et on calcule le poids apparent de cet ensemble, on détermine la marge de tension en tête de l'ensemble, en mode déconnecté de la tête du puits, compte tenu du poids apparent et de la tension amplifiée en tête par les mouvements du support flottant auquel est suspendu l'ensemble, dans le cas où la marge de tension correspond à une valeur proche d'une valeur déterminée, on calcule les contraintes de Von-Mises dans toutes les sections du tube, en mode connecté à la tête du puits, dans le cas où les contraintes sont proche d'un critère déterminé en relation avec la limite élastique du matériau du tube: on vérifie par calcul la charge sur chaque composant de l'ensemble prolongateur, ainsi que sa fatigue en dynamique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] GB 2342938 A 20000426 - INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]
  • [A] WO 0058598 A1 20001005 - PGS OFFSHORE TECHNOLOGY AS [NO], et al
  • [XY] WYBRO, P., DAVIES, K.: "The Dorado Field Production Risers", SPE 11549, December 1982 (1982-12-01), XP002188781
  • [A] GARDNER, T., KOTCH, M.: "Dynamic Analysis of Risers by the Element Method", SPE 6310, 3 May 1976 (1976-05-03), XP002188782
  • [A] FERNANDES: "UP-TO-DATE SPREADSHEET PROGRAM FOR PRELIMINARY ANALYSIS OF FLEXIBLE AND STEEL CATENARY RISERS USING CATENARY CONCEPTS", September 1997, COMPUTATIONAL MECHANICS PUBLICATION, SOUTHAMPTON BOSTON, XP001059619

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260670 A1 20021127; EP 1260670 B1 20080102; AT 382771 T 20080115; DE 60224323 D1 20080214; DK 1260670 T3 20080513; FR 2825116 A1 20021129; FR 2825116 B1 20031205; US 2003026663 A1 20030206; US 7630866 B2 20091208

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140521

2015-01-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140531

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080403

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080521

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080403

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080402

2008-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080413

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-07-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-05-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60224323 P 20080214

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050609

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI