Global Patent Index - EP 1260677 A2

EP 1260677 A2 2002-11-27 - Axial turbine with containment

Title (en)

Axial turbine with containment

Title (de)

Axialturbine mit Berstschutz

Title (fr)

Turbine axiale avec protection contre des éclatements

Publication

EP 1260677 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010986 A

Priority

DE 10125250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10125250C1] The axial turbine for an exhaust gas turboloader has an exhaust gas diffuser (9) whose outer wall (10) is in two radial sections (11, 12) with an annular support wall (13) between them. The outer radial section (11) extends over the axial region of the turbine disk (7). A cover ring (19) is fitted between the support wall and inner section (12) of the diffuser. The wall (5) of the turbine housing section (4) on the gas exit side extends radially over the central plane (23) of the turbine.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Axialturbine (1) eines Abgasturboladers mit einem aus einem Turbinenzuströmgehäuse (2) und einem Turbinenabströmgehäuse (4) ausgebildeten Turbinengehäuse, in diesem eine von einer Welle (6) getragene Turbinenscheibe (7) angeordnet ist, bei der die Turbinenscheibe (7) nach außen von einem Abgasdiffusor (9) unter Ausbildung eines Strömungskanals begrenzt ist, so weiterzubilden, dass das Austreten von Bruchstücken einer geborstenen Turbinenscheibe aus dem Turbinengehäuse auch bei extrem hohen Umfangsgeschwindigkeiten verhindert werden kann, ist vorgesehen, dass die Außenwand (10) des Abgasdiffusors (9) im axialen Bereich der Turbinenscheibe (7) in radialer Richtung mit einer Außen- (11) und einer Innenkontur (12) ausgeführt ist und zwischen der Außen- (11) und Innenkontur (12) eine ringförmige Stützwandung (13) vorgesehen ist, wobei die Außenkontur (11) in Form eines ringförmigen Verlängerungsstücks ausgeführt ist, das über den axialen Bereich der Turbinenscheibe (7) gezogen ausgestaltet ist, dass ein zwischen Stützwandung (13) und Innenkontur (12) des Abgasdiffusors (9) angeordneter Abdeckring (19) für die Turbinenscheibe (7) vorgesehen ist, und dass Turbinenzuström- (2) und Turbinenabströmgehäuse (4) derart miteinander verbunden sind, dass die gaseintrittseitige Wand (5) des Turbinenabströmgehäuses (4) in radialer Richtung über der Mittelebene (23) der Turbinenscheibe (7) steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 21/04; F01D 1/20; F02C 6/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 39/00 (2006.01); F01D 21/04 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 21/045 (2013.01); F05D 2220/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 10125250 C1 20020912; DE 10125250 C5 20070329; DE 50207358 D1 20060810; EP 1260677 A2 20021127; EP 1260677 A3 20050209; EP 1260677 B1 20060628; EP 1260677 B2 20161102; JP 2003003804 A 20030108; JP 4153722 B2 20080924

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-15 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2016-11-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20161102

2016-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2016-11-02 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50207358

2015-05-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG

- Effective date: 20070328

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110517

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110517

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AN DIESEL & TURBO SE

- Free text: MAN B&W DIESEL AG# #86224 AUGSBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE#STADTBACHSTRASSE 1#86153 AUGSBURG (DE)

2010-04-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL SE

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAN B&W DIESEL AG

- Free text: MAN B&W DIESEL AG# #86224 AUGSBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAN B&W DIESEL AG# #86224 AUGSBURG (DE)

2007-05-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG

- Effective date: 20070328

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207358 P 20060810

2006-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-06-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2005-04-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI