Global Patent Index - EP 1260679 A2

EP 1260679 A2 2002-11-27 - Tappet in a combustion engine

Title (en)

Tappet in a combustion engine

Title (de)

Tassenstössel einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Poussoir de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1260679 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009538 A

Priority

DE 10123966 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10123966A1] The bucket tappet (1) has a hollow cylindrical jacket (2), one endface (3) of which has a surface (5) for contact with the cam. The jacket is appreciably lower in height than the bucket tappet as a whole. The contact surface is made thinner as it is raised from the endface. But the surface is on a very rigid base, so the metal forming it can be of significantly smaller thickness (d).

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen ist ein Tassenstößel (1) für einen Ventiltrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem hohlzylindrischen Hemd (2), dessen eine Stirnseite (3) mit einem Boden (5) für einen Nockenkontakt verbunden ist. Dabei besitzt das Hemd (2) erfindungsgemäß eine deutlich geringere Höhe als der Tassenstößel (1) insgesamt, wobei der Boden (5) dachartig verjüngt von der Stirnseite (3) abgehoben ist. Aufgrund dieser Ausbildung liegt ein sehr steifer Boden (5) vor, wodurch es gelingt, dessen Dicke (d) signifikant gegenüber bisherig ausgeführten Bodendicken zu minimieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/14; F01L 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/24 (2006.01); F01L 1/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/143 (2013.01); F01L 1/25 (2013.01); F01L 2820/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260679 A2 20021127; EP 1260679 A3 20030813; EP 1260679 B1 20050209; DE 10123966 A1 20021121; JP 2003003806 A 20030108; JP 4180302 B2 20081112; US 2002170516 A1 20021121; US 6622679 B2 20030923

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH &, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20150323

2015-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH &, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20150323

2015-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20150323

2015-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20150323

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20140211

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH &, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH &, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH &, , DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50202197

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100426

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-04-14 [REG FR AU] OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT

2006-04-14 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-08-03 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: BRETTING, WERNER

2005-08-03 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MOENIUS, HANS

2005-08-03 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: OTTEN, REINHOLD

2005-08-03 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PATER, PIET

2005-07-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INA- SCHAEFFLER KG

2005-07-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2005-06-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202197 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/14 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/24 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 13/00 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/16 B

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI